Doering, Michele Marie (CPSO#: 66573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Mental Health Care
850 Highbury Avenue
London ON  N6A 4H1
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47374
Fax: (519) 455-7151
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELE MARIE DOERING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOERING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998