Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Doerksen, David Cornelius (CPSO#: 24467)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Mar 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-1661
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dental Health Centre
3475 North Service Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5R7
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

600 Tecumseh Rd. E.
Suite 139
Windsor ON  N8X 4X9
Canada
Phone: 519 254 7511
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David C. Doerksen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Doerksen ( CPSO# 24467 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-1661

Business Address:
600 Tecumseh Road East
Suite 139
Windsor ON  N8X 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 258-6766

Business Address:
3475 North Service Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5R7
Phone Number: (519) 258-5912

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CORNELIUS DOERKSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOERKSEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1972