Doherty, Geoffrey Paul (CPSO#: 76381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Winchester District Memorial Hosp.
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2422
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street, North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Geoff Doherty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Doherty ( CPSO# 76381 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
451 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY PAUL DOHERTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOHERTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006