Doig, George Angus (CPSO#: 23586)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Doig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 11 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013