Doiron, Daniel Joseph (CPSO#: 60080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
27 Warrington Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 3C7
Phone: (613) 737-2155
Fax: (613) 737-4199
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

383 Parkdale Avenue
Suite 105
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4R4
Canada
Phone: 613-737-2155
Fax: 613-737-4199
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL JOSEPH DOIRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOIRON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1989