Doiron, Maryjo (CPSO#: 93304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Superior Family Health Organization
Room 470
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone: (807) 344-8475
Fax: (807) 344-6323
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Doiron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Doiron ( CPSO# 93304 )

Business Address:
Suite 470
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone Number: (807) 344-8475

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYJO DOIRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOIRON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2013