Dojeiji, Suzan Samantha (CPSO#: 66737)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Rehabilitation Centre
505 Smyth Road
Room 1105
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-7350 Ext. 75591
Fax: (613) 737-6877
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Dojeiji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dojeiji ( CPSO# 66737 )

Business Address:
The Rehabilitation Centre
505 Smyth Road
Room 1105B
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone Number: (613) 593-9103

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZAN SAMANTHA DOJEIJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOJEIJI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998