Dokainish, Hisham (CPSO#: 68917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC McMaster University Site
CVSRI-C3 111
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 40327
Fax: (905) 577-1474
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hisham Dokainish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dokainish ( CPSO# 68917 )

Business Address:
HHSC McMaster University Site
CVSRI-C3 111
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 13 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HISHAM DOKAINISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOKAINISH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2009