Dolan, Eugen James (CPSO#: 29783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Billings Clinic
2825 8th Avenue North
P O Box 35100
Billings MT  59107
United States
Phone: (406) 238-2343

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Montana
USA - Ohio
USA - Wyoming

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 03 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EUGEN JAMES DOLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOLAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1978