Dolan, Jeremiah Edward William (CPSO#: 42480)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008