Dolan, Sean Peter (CPSO#: 53143)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1989