Dombros, Nicholas (CPSO#: 27845)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Salonika, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 2003