Domes, Trustin Scott (CPSO#: 82859)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2011