Domingo, Minerva Torres (CPSO#: 51678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Mar 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
20 Research Place
Chelmsord MA  01824
United States
Phone: (978) 256-1858

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MINERVA TORRES DOMINGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOMINGO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1989