Dominguez, Rodolfo (CPSO#: 100999)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hillside Medical Centre
Unit 403
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: 416-261-7223
Fax: 416-261-6374
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dominguez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dominguez ( CPSO# 100999)

Business Address:
Hillside Medical Centre
Unit 403
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 261-7223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RODOLFO DOMINGUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOMINGUEZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Oct 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2016