Dominic, Anna Maria (CPSO#: 70877)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 1996 to 15 Nov 1996
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999