Dominic, Arunmozhi (CPSO#: 91977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2016

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 6129
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Oct 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Aug 2009 to 03 Nov 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 11 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 2011 to 11 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 11 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Oct 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 13 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Arunmozhi  Dominic  may practise internal medicine at the Juravinski
                  Hospital & Cancer Centre in  Hamilton,  Ontario,  while under supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires  on  December  31,
                  2017 or  when  Dr.  Dominic's  eligibility  to  take the Royal College of
                  Physicians  and Surgeons of Canada examination expires,  whichever  comes
                  first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor  notifies  the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Dominic's knowledge, skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College  by  the  due  date  or  if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Dominic's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on October 1, 2016, and will expire  on  or
                  before December 31, 2017, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.