Dominique, Francis Stephen (CPSO#: 46937)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 17 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001