Domovitch, Edward (CPSO#: 28633)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008