Donahue, Jean Pierre Donald (CPSO#: 42994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Apr 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 Inverness Plaza
Number 121
Birmingham AL  35242-4800
United States
Phone: (205) 295-9415
Fax: (205) 295-9418

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Alabama

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN PIERRE DONALD DONAHUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONAHUE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1985