Donahue, Paula Catherine (CPSO#: 33166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Chemotherapy Unit
St Thomas ON  N5P 3W2
Phone: (519) 631-2020 Ext. 2217
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel Keenleyside Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Keenleyside ( CPSO# 32979 )
Dr. P. Donahue ( CPSO# 33166 )

Business Address:
285 Bridge Street
Port Stanley ON  N5L 1J5
Phone Number: (519) 782-3667


Corporation Name: Paula Donahue Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Donahue ( CPSO# 33166 )

Business Address:
St. Thomas Psychiatric Hospital
St Thomas ON  N5P 3V9
Phone Number: (519) 631-8510

Business Address:
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Chemotherapy Unit
PO Box Station Main
St Thomas ON  N5P 3W2
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care,St Thomas Mental Health Site St Thomas
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULA CATHERINE DONAHUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONAHUE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Oct 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1984