Donald, Christopher Richard (CPSO#: 25964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14 Ramblewood Drive
Unit 202
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 0C4
Phone: 705-422-1888
Fax: 705-422-1078
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Donald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Donald ( CPSO# 25964 )

Business Address:
202 - 14 Ramblewood Drive
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 0C4
Phone Number: (705) 422-1888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER RICHARD DONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONALD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1973