Donald, David Melville (CPSO#: 23637)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Nov 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Nov 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997