Donald, Shirley Fern (CPSO#: 32301)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.F. Donald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital, 170 Colborne Street West, Orillia, ON L3V 2Z3
Date Received: 15 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015