Donaldson, Cindy-Lou (CPSO#: 63706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carlisle Medical Center
1493 Centre Road
Carlisle ON  L0R 1H0
Phone: (905) 689-3301
Fax: (905) 689-5772
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cindy Donaldson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Donaldson ( CPSO# 63706 )

Business Address:
Carlisle Medical Centre
1493 Centre Road
P O Box 311
Carlisle ON  L0R 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 689-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CINDY-LOU DONALDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONALDSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1992