Donat, Diane June (CPSO#: 56985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Division
200 Elizabeth Street
12 N 214
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3592
Fax: (416) 340-3314
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE JUNE DONAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONAT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1987