Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Donen, Lauren Arlene (CPSO#: 60869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
72 Loch Isle Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8G8
Phone: (613) 627-5485
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Donen ( CPSO# 60869 )

Business Address:
72 Loch Isle Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8G8
Phone Number: (613) 627-5485

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN ARLENE DONEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990