Dong, Frederick Fung Tik (CPSO#: 95601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pacific Medical Clinic
Unit F 33
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham ON  L3R 0Y5
Phone: (905) 604-7889
Fax: (905) 604-7890
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frederick Dong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Dong ( CPSO# 95601 )

Business Address:
Pacific Medical Clinic
F33 - 4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham ON  L3R 0Y5
Phone Number: (905) 604-7889

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICK FUNG TIK DONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2014