Donnelly, Brian Nichol (CPSO#: 31472)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN NICHOL DONNELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONNELLY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1980