Donner, Elizabeth Jacqueline (CPSO#: 70029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Neurology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7037
Fax: (416) 813-6334
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH JACQUELINE DONNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2003