Donovan, Lois Elizabeth (CPSO#: 59368)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 28 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992