Donovan, Sarah Georgina (CPSO#: 21270)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011