Donsky, Geoffrey (CPSO#: 73822)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
DI Department
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 686-6411 Ext. 4305
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

suite 402
220 dundas street west
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Canada
Phone: 905-430-1781
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Levine Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Galante ( CPSO# 98914 )
Dr. W. Wei ( CPSO# 86891 )
Dr. A. Raikhlin ( CPSO# 86803 )
Dr. M. Asch ( CPSO# 52679 )
Dr. G. Dotsikas ( CPSO# 66718 )
Dr. G. Donsky ( CPSO# 73822 )
Dr. N. Isaac ( CPSO# 71092 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 81024 )
Dr. G. Lacey ( CPSO# 67159 )
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )
Dr. V. Massaad ( CPSO# 75329 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )

Business Address:
Baywood X-Ray & Ultrasound
Baywood Medical Clinic
101 - 95 Bayly Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
King Street X-Ray & Ultrasound
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-7702

Business Address:
Bowmanville X-Ray & Ultrasound
1101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2727

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711


Corporation Name: Dr. G. Donksy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Donsky ( CPSO# 73822 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
DI Department
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
200 Brock Street North
Whitby ON  L1N 4H5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY DONSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2004