Dontigny-Duplain, Laurie (CPSO#: 108146)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2015 to 14 Nov 2015
Elective Trainee - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Elective Trainee - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2016