Donworth, Michael John (CPSO#: 31649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Dec 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospita
395 Carie St.
Strathroy
Strathroy ON  N7G 3C9
Phone: (519) 245-1550 Ext. 5533
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Donworth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Donworth ( CPSO# 31649 )

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex General Hosp
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3E2
Phone Number: (519) 245-1550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 10 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 10 Dec 2013 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 10, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Michael John
            Donworth, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Donworth
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Donworth shall practise only emergency medicine in a hospital
                  setting.  Dr. Donworth shall not prescribe for chronic non-malignant pain
                  the following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the
                  corresponding regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized
                  as follows:
                  
                  
            Drug/Substance                             Relinquished      

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)          X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)          X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                             X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)                    X

            Monitored Drugs                            
            (from the Ministry of Health and Long-Term
             Care List of Monitored Drugs)                         X