Doobay, Calesh Dowraj (CPSO#: 87617)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uxbridge Health Centre
Unit B
2 Elgin Park Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone: (905) 852-1009
Fax: (905) 852-3531
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Calesh D. Doobay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Doobay ( CPSO# 87617 )

Business Address:
Uxbridge Family Health Clinic
Unit B
2 Elgin Park Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9L 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 852-1009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CALESH DOWRAJ DOOBAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOOBAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 29 Feb 2008
International Specialist Physician - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 May 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2009