Dooler, Deborah Susan (CPSO#: 83117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 Prince Charles Drive
Welland ON  L3C 6B5
Phone: (905) 735-1701
Fax: (905) 735-1703
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Dooler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dooler ( CPSO# 83117 )

Business Address:
555 Prince Charles Drive
Welland ON  L3C 6B5
Phone Number: (905) 735-1701

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH SUSAN DOOLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOOLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007