Dooner, James (CPSO#: 45956)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jun 2008


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1976 to 14 Jun 1977
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2008