Dorasamy, Punginathn (CPSO#: 78745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 12 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
HHSC - General Hospital Campus
Room 409 4th Floor McMaster Wing
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46808
Fax: (905) 577-1418
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Punginathn Dorasamy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dorasamy ( CPSO# 78745 )

Business Address:
Department of Internal Medicine
HHSC - General Hospital Campus
Room 409, 4th Floor - McMaster Wing
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PUNGINATHN DORASAMY may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF MEDICINE, DIVISION OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. DORASAMY holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. DORASAMY may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. DORASAMY no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. DORASAMY no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. DORASAMY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2005