Dore, Marc Joseph Pierre (CPSO#: 89146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Dore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dore ( CPSO# 89146 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 28 Aug 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC JOSEPH PIERRE DORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2011 to 28 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2012 to 28 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2013