Dore, Marcel Joseph Renato (CPSO#: 56059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Dec 1998

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MJR Dore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dore ( CPSO# 56059 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1998
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1998
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2004

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2004 Active View Details [+]
            The following terms, conditions and limitations, in effect from December 8,
            1998 and amended March 23, 2004, are imposed on the certificate of registration
            held by Dr. Marcel Joseph Dore:

                  Dr. Marcel Joseph Dore is prohibited from practising psychotherapy until
                  he is able to satisfy the Registrar, based on the reports of two experts
                  acceptable to the Registrar, that this term and condition ought to be
                  removed.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Dec 1998
Summary:

 In December, 1998, Dr. Dore entered a plea of no contest and the Discipline Committee found Dr. 
 Dore guilty of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of 
 the profession. The Committee ordered the following penalty:

1)	Reprimand to be recorded on the 
 Register 

2)	Terms and conditions on the certificate of registration:

(a)	Dr. Dore continue 
 under the care and treatment of his psychiatrist or another psychiatrist acceptable to the 
 Registrar, such psychiatrist to provide quarterly reports satisfactory to the Registrar until such 
 time as the Registrar has determined that such reports are no longer required;

(b)	Dr. Dore be 
 prohibited from practising psychotherapy until he is able to satisfy the Registrar, based on the 
 reports of two experts acceptable to the Registrar, that this term and condition ought to be 
 removed;

3)	A four-month suspension of Dr. Dore(s certificate of registration, such suspension to 
 be suspended if Dr. Dore completes to the satisfaction of the Registrar the following three 
 requirements:

(a)	participates and completes the PREP assessment program,
(b)	takes and completes 
 the Physician Prescribing Skills Course provided by the College,
(c)	takes and completes a course 
 acceptable to the Registrar on physician-patient boundaries;

the suspension is to commence on a 
 date to be determined by the Registrar, not to exceed eight months from the final disposition of 
 this matter.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 07, 1998