Dore, Steven (CPSO#: 57364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Arches
13 Berry Hill Road
Paget DV 03
Bermuda
Phone: 441-236-6145

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Bermuda

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN DORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1991