Dorenbaum, David (CPSO#: 50451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
554 Spadina Crescent
Toronto ON  M5S 2J9
Phone: (416) 925-8536
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clarke Institute of Psychiatry
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Dorenbaum & K.Z. Heasman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Heasman ( CPSO# 56778 )
Dr. D. Dorenbaum ( CPSO# 50451 )

Business Address:
554 Spadina Crescent
Toronto ON  M5S 2J9
Phone Number: (416) 925-8536

Business Address:
Clarke Institute of Psychiatry
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
Colonnade Business Building
Suite 501
131 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 1R1
Phone Number: (416) 928-0361

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID DORENBAUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORENBAUM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1988