Dorey, Michael Wayne (CPSO#: 85926)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alberta Eye MD
103, 2731 Hewes Way
Edmonton AB  T6L 6W6
Phone: (780) 450-3335
Fax: (780) 461-9430

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL WAYNE DOREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOREY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Feb 2007 to 02 Mar 2007
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2009