Dorfman, Jason Kevin (CPSO#: 52310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Jun 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
145 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2N 3A7
Phone: (416) 635-2895
Fax: (416) 635-2838
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

306 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J9
Canada
Phone: (905) 434-8539
Fax: (905) 434-7904
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason K. Dorfman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dorfman ( CPSO# 52310 )

Business Address:
202 - 145 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 635-2895

Business Address:
306 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 434-8539

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 21 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 26 Mar 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 26 Mar 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 23, 2003, Dr. Jason K. Dorfman undertakes not to engage in any
            incisional ophthalmological surgery in any jurisdiction, but he may perform:

                  (a) Pterygium surgery; and 
                  (b) Non-incisional laser surgery
                  
                  
                  
            As from March 26, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Jason Kevin Dorfman,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Dorfman to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                        DR. JASON KEVIN DORFMAN
                                            ("Dr. Dorfman")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")




            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "public register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Dorfman, certificate of registration number 52310, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice with respect to ophthalmological surgery.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Dorfman, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (4)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dorfman, undertake that I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment will include direct observation of my
                        care, a review of my records from cases observed, and a chart
                        review, and that the Reassessment may also include, interviews with
                        colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other
                        tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dorfman, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to
                        abide by those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved
                        by the ICR Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Dorfman, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that
                        the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported
                        to the College and the report may form the basis of further action
                        by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Dorfman, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Dorfman, undertake that, following the decision referenced
                        in section (4)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of
                        the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Dorfman, hereby consent to any of the following being
                        included on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations
                        on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23
                        of the Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (4)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (5)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dorfman, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dorfman, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Dorfman, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person or institution who
                        may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Dorfman, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A". 
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Dorfman, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Dorfman, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Dorfman, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Dorfman, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Dorfman, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the public register during the time
                  period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (11)  I, Dr. Dorfman, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  public register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in
                  effect:

                        The College received information about Dr. Dorfman's surgical
                        standard of practice. As a result, Dr. Dorfman's practice will be
                        reassessed by an assessor selected by the College.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Dorfman, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Dorfman, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Dorfman, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff and
                  Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (d)   which he or she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of
                        harm to my patients.
                  
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 26, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Jason Kevin Dorfman to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 26, 2016:

The College received information about Dr. Dorfman’s surgical standard of practice. As a result, Dr. Dorfman’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College.