Doria, Andrea Schwarz (CPSO#: 75470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Jan 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:UNIVERSIDADE FEDERAL DO PARA, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6079
Fax: (416) 813-7591
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jan 2004 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Jan 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 Jan 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2008 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Andrea Schwarz Doria may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Medical  Imaging, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Doria  holds  a  geographical   full-time   teaching   or  research
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements  of
                        her appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate will automatically expire when Dr. Doria no longer holds
                  the appointment, referred to in clause 1.