Dorman, Thomas Alfred (CPSO#: 21601)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Dec 1996