Dornack, Patrick Thomas (CPSO#: 101907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
404-27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: (416) 533-6488
Fax: 416-533-9204
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Jan 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Patrick  Thomas  Dornack  may  practise  medicine  independently in family
            medicine.