Dort, Joseph Clyde (CPSO#: 33111)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996