Dortaj, Nick (CPSO#: 108917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 May 2016

Expiry Date:  26 May 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 May 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:KERMAN UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
180 parsons road
suite 33
South Simcoe FHO
Alliston ON  L9R 1E8
Phone: 705-435-6500
Fax: 705-435-6501
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dortaj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Dortaj ( CPSO# 108917)

Business Address:
Bathurst Walk in Clinic and Family Practice
Unit 101
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 633-3629

Business Address:
Alliston Family Physicians
Suite 41
180 Parsons Road
Alliston ON  L9R 1E8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 May 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 May 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 May 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Nick Dortaj may practise family medicine at:

                  (i)   Bathurst  Walk  in  Clinic & Family Practice in Downsview, Ontario,
                        while under supervision  coordinated  by a supervisor acceptable to
                        the College; and
                  
                  (ii)  180  Parsons  Road  in  Alliston, Ontario while  under  supervision
                        coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires on May 26, 2019 or
                  when Dr. Dortaj's eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of
                  Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisors notify the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Dortaj's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, do not provide the
                        required  reports  to the College by the due date or if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the supervisors are  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Dortaj's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on May 27, 2016, and will expire on  or before
                  May 26, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.